MAV - mathculator

Report
Making Your Students
Feel Like A genius
( And maybe you )
What level of maths do I need
to survive this session ?
DO I HAVE TO BE REALLY
GOOD AT
MATHS TO SURVIVE THIS
CLASS ???
If you
understand your times tables
can add and subtract one digit numbers
Basic knowledge of fractions
Can use a calculator
(to check if you are really correct
and smarter than you think)
Want to learn
Are willing to approach things positively
•
•
•
•
•
•
Solve the answers
• Think of a number
• Double it
• Add 14
• Halve your answer
• Subtract the original answer
• Your answer is 7
Solve the answers
• Write down a 3 digit number
with digits decreasing, eg. 861
• Reverse this number and
•
•
subtract it from the first
number
Take this answer and add it to
the reverse of the number
Your answer is 1089
Solve the answers
• Using 1089 from before
•
•
multiply this by ANY 3 digit
number
How many digits in your
answer ?
Tell me any 5 of your digits
Solve the answers
• Write down any 2 1 digit number
•
•
•
underneath each other and add
them 8 times.
Eg
1.
6
2.
5
3. 11
When you have done this add the
10 numbers up
I need someone to write their
number on the board Without the
total.
I will Guess the total before finish
they are finished writing all the
number up.
Solve the answers
• Write down any number from
•
•
•
•
each of the 3 number sets
A
B
C
8573
5646
2565
2966
4179
4581
4586
8544
2673
4874
9624
5625
7655
2595
7236
Select any digit from each of the
select numbers and enter under
Columns headed A, B or C
Repeat this till all digits are used.
Add up the new 4 3-digit numbers
Answer for this total is 2528
Multiplying 2 digit Numbers
Eg.
11
13
x 12
x 13
ANSWER
13 2
16 9
ADD 11 plus 2 ( = 13)
Multiply 1 x 2 ( = 2 )
Multiplying 2 digit Numbers
Eg.
17
19
x 13
x 19
21
81
ANSWER
20
28
221
361
ADD 17 plus 3 ( = 20)
Multiply 7 x 3 ( = 21 )
Squaring a number ending in 5
Eg. 752 = 7 x 8 and 52
= 56 and 25
= 5625
(N5)2 = n x (n+1) and 52
= n x (n+1) and 25
= n(n+1)25
Squaring a number between 30 and 70
Eg. 522 = 27 and 22
= 2704
[27 : 25+2] [04:2places for 4]
592
592
632
=?
= 34 and 92
= 3481
= 38 and 132
169
= 38
= 3969
632
= ?
[34 : 25+9] [81:2places for 81]
[38 : 25+13] [169:2places for 169]
Squaring a number between 30 and 70
Eg. 482 = 23 and 22
= 2304
[23 : 25-2] [04:2places for 4]
472
=?
392
=?
472 = 22 and 32 [22 : 25-3] [04:2places for 9]
= 2209
392 = 14 and 112 [14: 25-11] [121:2places for 121]
121
= 14
= 1521
Squaring a number between 80 and 120
Eg. 1032 = 106 and 32
= 10609
[06 : two x 3] [09:2places for 9]
ANSWER
1072 = 11449 [14 : two x 7]
[49:2places for 7x7]
ANSWER
1092 = 11881
1122
144
= 124
= 12544
ANSWER
Multiplying 2 numbers between 80 and 120
97 x 98 = 98 ( -2 : less than 100)
97 ( -3 : less than 100)
= 9506
[95 : 97- 3 : 98 - 2] [06:2places for 6]
91 x 97 = 91
97
= 8827
( -9 : less than 100)
( -3 : less than 100)
[88 : 91- 3 : 97 - 9] [27:2places for 6]
Multiplying 2 numbers between 80 and 120
107 x 112 = 107
112
= 11984
( 7 : morethan 100)
( 12 : more than 100)
[19 : 7+12 : 12 + 7] [84: 7 x 12]
103 x 115 = 103
( 3 : more than 100)
115 ( 15 : more than 100)
= 11845
[18 : 3 + 15 : 15 + 3] [45 : 3 x 15]
Squaring a number between 80 and 120
Eg. 1032 = 106 and 32
= 10609
[06 : two x 3] [09:2places for 9]
ANSWER
1072 = 11449 [14 : two x 7]
[49:2places for 7x7]
ANSWER
1092 = 11881
1122
144
= 124
= 12544
ANSWER
55 times 55 = ???
552 = 5 x 6 and 52
= 30 and 25
= 3025
55 times 75 = ???
55 x 75 = 5 x 7 + 6 and 52
= 41 and 25
= 4125
Multiplying 2 mixed numbers with the
same units and fractions adding to 1
ANSWER
Multiplying a number ending
in digits that add to 10
Eg 75 x 75
= 7 x 8 and 5 x 5
= 56 and 25
= 5625 (as before)
84 x 86 = ?
84 x 86
= 8 x 9 and 4 x 6
= 72 and 24
= 7224
Squaring 2 digit numbers
Eg 732 = 76 x 70 + 32
= 5320 + 9
= 5329
or 732
= 702 +2(70 x 3) + 32
= 4900 + 2(210) + 9
= 5329
(ab)2 = (a+b)(a-b) + b2
or
(ab)2 = a2 + 2(a+b) + b2
Thank you and Have a great holiday

similar documents